House | 05/28/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/26/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 5770 | |
House | 05/26/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 5770 | |
House | 05/26/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/24/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 4057 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Filed |