House | 02/25/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 02/24/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 493 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 493 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 02/22/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/16/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 378 | |
House | 01/26/2011 | Filed |