House | 04/01/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Record vote | RV#163 | Journal Page: 1132 |
House | 03/30/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1132 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1125 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 941 | |
House | 03/17/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 538 | |
House | 02/21/2011 | Filed |