House | 04/19/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1798 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Record vote | RV#375 | Journal Page: 1801 |
House | 04/14/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1801 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1789 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1599 | |
House | 03/28/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2011 | Referred to House Administration | Journal Page: 596 | |
House | 03/02/2011 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 596 | |
House | 03/01/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 574 | |
House | 02/22/2011 | Filed |