Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR83

Introduced
1/10/11  
Refer
2/14/11  
Enrolled
4/5/11  

Caption

Honoring the life of Cesar Chavez and recognizing the month beginning March 31, 2012, as Cesar Chavez Farmworker Appreciation Month.

Impact

HR83's passage serves as a formal acknowledgment by the Texas legislature of the historical and ongoing contributions of farmworkers, and it aims to foster a greater appreciation and awareness of the challenges they face. This recognition at the state level may encourage local communities to reflect on and implement programs and policies that support the welfare of farmworkers. It also aims to inspire younger generations to engage with social justice and labor rights issues.

Summary

House Resolution 83 (HR83) is a tribute recognizing the life and contributions of Cesar Chavez, highlighting the significance of March 31, 2012, as Cesar Chavez Farmworker Appreciation Month. The resolution emphasizes the struggles faced by farmworkers, which Chavez passionately advocated for throughout his life. By remembering him, the bill seeks to honor his legacy of social justice and civil rights, particularly for the disenfranchised and impoverished communities that he championed.

Sentiment

The sentiment around HR83 appears largely positive, celebrating the life and legacy of Cesar Chavez. Legislators and community members who support the resolution view it as a necessary tribute to an influential figure in American history. However, there may also be differing views on the extent to which Chavez's legacy is recognized in contemporary policies affecting farmworkers, suggesting a need for ongoing advocacy in labor rights.

Contention

While HR83 itself is a non-controversial tribute, it indirectly brings to light the ongoing challenges faced by farmworkers and the need for continued advocacy for their rights. The resolution may stimulate discussion on labor rights, social justice, and the need to address inequalities in the agricultural sector, which could lead to more contention regarding specific legislative actions to support these workers.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HR61

Recognizing the month beginning March 31, 2018, as Cesar Chavez Farmworker Appreciation Month.

TX HR59

Recognizing the month beginning March 31, 2017, as Cesar Chavez Farmworker Appreciation Month.

TX HR82

Honoring the life of Cesar Chavez and recognizing the month beginning March 31, 2011, as Cesar Chavez Farmworker Appreciation Month.

TX HR154

Recognizing the month beginning March 31, 2015, as Cesar Chavez Farmworker Appreciation Month.

TX HR155

Recognizing the month beginning March 31, 2016, as Cesar Chavez Farmworker Appreciation Month.

TX HR84

Honoring the life of Cesar Chavez and recognizing the month beginning March 31, 2014, as Cesar Chavez Farmworker Appreciation Month.

TX HR85

Honoring the life of Cesar Chavez and recognizing the month beginning March 31, 2013, as Cesar Chavez Farmworker Appreciation Month.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.