House | 04/05/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1165 | |
House | 03/31/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 1165 | |
House | 03/31/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 02/14/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 344 | |
House | 01/10/2011 | Filed |