House | 04/14/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 1644 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 1644 | |
House | 03/31/2011 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 1163 | |
House | 03/31/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1111 | |
House | 03/14/2011 | Filed |