House | 05/19/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3867 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3863 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | RV#1044 | Journal Page: 3867 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 3867 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Laid before the House | Journal Page: 3857 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/07/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3300 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | Journal Page: 1993 | |
House | 03/17/2011 | Filed |