House | 04/25/2011 | Reported enrolled | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Adopted | Journal Page: 2104 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2104 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 1778 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | Journal Page: 1142 | |
House | 03/17/2011 | Filed |