Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1190 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Gallegos S.B. No. 1190
 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2011; March 16, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 29, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 April 29, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1190 By:  Gallegos


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the appeal of an indefinite suspension of a municipal
 firefighter.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 143.120, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows:
 (c-1)  A temporary suspension of a fire fighter under
 Subsection (c)(2) may not exceed 90 calendar days.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *