Senate | 05/24/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
House | 05/23/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 5038 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3320 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2807 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2807 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2807 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2807 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2807 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2807 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2807 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2509 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 570 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 570 | |
Senate | 03/04/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |