Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1193 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Rodriguez S.B. No. 1193
 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2011; March 16, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 May 17, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1193 By:  Nichols


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to coordination of services provided by Medicaid managed
 care organizations and certain community centers and local mental
 health or mental retardation authorities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Section 533.005, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A contract between a managed care organization and the
 commission for the organization to provide health care services to
 recipients must contain:
 (1)  procedures to ensure accountability to the state
 for the provision of health care services, including procedures for
 financial reporting, quality assurance, utilization review, and
 assurance of contract and subcontract compliance;
 (2)  capitation rates that ensure the cost-effective
 provision of quality health care;
 (3)  a requirement that the managed care organization
 provide ready access to a person who assists recipients in
 resolving issues relating to enrollment, plan administration,
 education and training, access to services, and grievance
 procedures;
 (4)  a requirement that the managed care organization
 provide ready access to a person who assists providers in resolving
 issues relating to payment, plan administration, education and
 training, and grievance procedures;
 (5)  a requirement that the managed care organization
 provide information and referral about the availability of
 educational, social, and other community services that could
 benefit a recipient;
 (6)  procedures for recipient outreach and education;
 (7)  a requirement that the managed care organization
 make payment to a physician or provider for health care services
 rendered to a recipient under a managed care plan not later than the
 45th day after the date a claim for payment is received with
 documentation reasonably necessary for the managed care
 organization to process the claim, or within a period, not to exceed
 60 days, specified by a written agreement between the physician or
 provider and the managed care organization;
 (8)  a requirement that the commission, on the date of a
 recipient's enrollment in a managed care plan issued by the managed
 care organization, inform the organization of the recipient's
 Medicaid certification date;
 (9)  a requirement that the managed care organization
 comply with Section 533.006 as a condition of contract retention
 and renewal;
 (10)  a requirement that the managed care organization
 provide the information required by Section 533.012 and otherwise
 comply and cooperate with the commission's office of inspector
 general;
 (11)  a requirement that the managed care
 organization's usages of out-of-network providers or groups of
 out-of-network providers may not exceed limits for those usages
 relating to total inpatient admissions, total outpatient services,
 and emergency room admissions determined by the commission;
 (12)  if the commission finds that a managed care
 organization has violated Subdivision (11), a requirement that the
 managed care organization reimburse an out-of-network provider for
 health care services at a rate that is equal to the allowable rate
 for those services, as determined under Sections 32.028 and
 32.0281, Human Resources Code;
 (13)  a requirement that the organization use advanced
 practice nurses in addition to physicians as primary care providers
 to increase the availability of primary care providers in the
 organization's provider network;
 (14)  a requirement that the managed care organization
 reimburse a federally qualified health center or rural health
 clinic for health care services provided to a recipient outside of
 regular business hours, including on a weekend day or holiday, at a
 rate that is equal to the allowable rate for those services as
 determined under Section 32.028, Human Resources Code, if the
 recipient does not have a referral from the recipient's primary
 care physician; [and]
 (15)  a requirement that the managed care organization
 develop, implement, and maintain a system for tracking and
 resolving all provider appeals related to claims payment, including
 a process that will require:
 (A)  a tracking mechanism to document the status
 and final disposition of each provider's claims payment appeal;
 (B)  the contracting with physicians who are not
 network providers and who are of the same or related specialty as
 the appealing physician to resolve claims disputes related to
 denial on the basis of medical necessity that remain unresolved
 subsequent to a provider appeal; and
 (C)  the determination of the physician resolving
 the dispute to be binding on the managed care organization and
 provider; and
 (16)  a requirement that the managed care organization
 coordinate the care of each recipient who is receiving services
 through the managed care organization and through a community
 center created under Subchapter A, Chapter 534, Health and Safety
 Code, or local mental health or mental retardation authority with
 the community center or authority, as applicable.
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (d), Section 533.0352, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (d)  In developing the local service area plan, the local
 mental health or mental retardation authority shall:
 (1)  solicit information regarding community needs
 from:
 (A)  representatives of the local community;
 (B)  consumers of community-based mental health
 and mental retardation services and members of the families of
 those consumers;
 (C)  consumers of services of state schools for
 persons with mental retardation, members of families of those
 consumers, and members of state school volunteer services councils,
 if a state school is located in the local service area of the local
 authority; and
 (D)  other interested persons; [and]
 (2)  consider:
 (A)  criteria for assuring accountability for,
 cost-effectiveness of, and relative value of service delivery
 options;
 (B)  goals to minimize the need for state hospital
 and community hospital care;
 (C)  goals to ensure a client with mental
 retardation is placed in the least restrictive environment
 appropriate to the person's care;
 (D)  opportunities for innovation to ensure that
 the local authority is communicating to all potential and incoming
 consumers about the availability of services of state schools for
 persons with mental retardation in the local service area of the
 local authority;
 (E)  goals to divert consumers of services from
 the criminal justice system;
 (F)  goals to ensure that a child with mental
 illness remains with the child's parent or guardian as appropriate
 to the child's care; and
 (G)  opportunities for innovation in services and
 service delivery; and
 (3)  include strategies in the plan that are designed
 to coordinate the care of each consumer who is receiving services
 through the local mental health or mental retardation authority and
 through a Medicaid managed care organization with the managed care
 organization.
 SECTION 3.  If before implementing any provision of this Act
 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
 waiver or authorization is granted.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *