House
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2259
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2259
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2168
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1344
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1288
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1288
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1288
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1288
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1288
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1288
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1288
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1085
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 576
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 576
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|