Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1257 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hegar, Watson S.B. No. 1257
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2011; March 16, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 20, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 20, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the annexation by certain conservation and reclamation
 districts of noncontiguous land in another county.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter J, Chapter 49, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 49.3021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 49.3021.  COUNTY CONSENT FOR CERTAIN ANNEXATIONS.
 Before a district may annex land that is noncontiguous to the
 district and located wholly or partly in a county other than the
 county or counties in which the district is located before the
 annexation, the county commissioners of the county in which the
 land to be annexed is located must consent by order or resolution to
 the proposed annexation.
 SECTION 2.  Section 49.3021, Water Code, as added by this
 Act, applies only to a petition requesting the annexation of land
 received by a district board under Section 49.301 or 49.302, Water
 Code, on or after the effective date of this Act. A petition
 requesting the annexation of land received by a district board
 under Section 49.301 or 49.302, Water Code, before the effective
 date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the
 petition is received, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *