Senate | 05/16/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/11/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2147 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2062 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 941 | |
Senate | 03/29/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 581 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 581 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |