Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1309 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hinojosa, Eltife S.B. No. 1309
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2011; March 16, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 May 9, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 9, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1309 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to rate adjustments by gas utilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 104, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 104.302 to read as follows:
 Sec. 104.302.  RATE ADJUSTMENTS.  (a)  In establishing a gas
 utility's rates, the railroad commission or municipal regulatory
 authority may, but is not required to, approve a tariff or rate
 schedule in which the rate for gas utility service is adjusted based
 on changes in the gas utility's revenues, expenses, or investments.
 (b)  Rates and charges resulting from tariffs or rate
 schedules established within a municipality by mutual agreement of
 the utility and the municipal regulatory authority shall be
 presumed reasonable by the railroad commission.
 (c)  This section does not:
 (1)  affect the original or appellate jurisdiction of
 the railroad commission or a municipal regulatory authority;
 (2)  change a tariff or rate schedule of a gas utility
 that is in effect on or before September 1, 2011; or
 (3)  limit the authority of the railroad commission or
 a municipal regulatory authority to review the gas utility's rate
 adjustment filings.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *