House
|
05/19/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 4116
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2794
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1669
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1669
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1669
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1668
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1668
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1668
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1668
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Watson
|
Journal Page: 1667
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1667
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1667
|
Senate
|
05/02/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1344
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 658
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 658
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|