1 | 1 | | By: Watson S.B. No. 1328 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2011; March 22, 2011, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 26, 2011, |
---|
4 | 4 | | reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the |
---|
5 | 5 | | following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 26, 2011, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1328 By: Gallegos |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
10 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 11 | | relating to optional dispute resolution methods regarding |
---|
12 | 12 | | educational services for students with a disability, including |
---|
13 | 13 | | individualized education program facilitation. |
---|
14 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
15 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 29, Education Code, is |
---|
16 | 16 | | amended by adding Sections 29.019 and 29.020 to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 17 | | Sec. 29.019. OPTIONAL DISPUTE RESOLUTION. (a) The agency |
---|
18 | 18 | | and each school district shall provide information to parents |
---|
19 | 19 | | regarding optional dispute resolution methods that may be used when |
---|
20 | 20 | | a dispute arises between the district and a parent of a student with |
---|
21 | 21 | | a disability. The information: |
---|
22 | 22 | | (1) must be included with other information provided |
---|
23 | 23 | | to the parent of a student with a disability; and |
---|
24 | 24 | | (2) may be provided in a written or electronic format. |
---|
25 | 25 | | (b) Information provided by the agency under this section |
---|
26 | 26 | | must indicate that individualized education program facilitation |
---|
27 | 27 | | is an optional dispute resolution method that some districts may |
---|
28 | 28 | | choose to provide on a voluntary basis. |
---|
29 | 29 | | (c) If a school district chooses to offer individualized |
---|
30 | 30 | | education program facilitation as an optional dispute resolution |
---|
31 | 31 | | method: |
---|
32 | 32 | | (1) the district may determine whether to offer |
---|
33 | 33 | | facilitation through an independent facilitator, through a |
---|
34 | 34 | | district employee serving as a facilitator, or through a |
---|
35 | 35 | | combination of those methods; |
---|
36 | 36 | | (2) the information provided by the district under |
---|
37 | 37 | | this section must include a description of any applicable |
---|
38 | 38 | | procedures for requesting the facilitation; and |
---|
39 | 39 | | (3) the facilitation must be provided at no cost to a |
---|
40 | 40 | | parent. |
---|
41 | 41 | | (d) The use or availability of an optional dispute |
---|
42 | 42 | | resolution method, including individualized education program |
---|
43 | 43 | | facilitation, may not in any manner be used to deny or delay the |
---|
44 | 44 | | right to pursue a special education complaint, mediation, or due |
---|
45 | 45 | | process hearing in accordance with federal law. |
---|
46 | 46 | | (e) The commissioner shall adopt rules necessary to |
---|
47 | 47 | | implement this section. |
---|
48 | 48 | | Sec. 29.020. INDEPENDENT INDIVIDUALIZED EDUCATION PROGRAM |
---|
49 | 49 | | FACILITATION. (a) The agency shall develop criteria and |
---|
50 | 50 | | procedures in accordance with this section applicable to |
---|
51 | 51 | | independent individualized education program facilitation provided |
---|
52 | 52 | | by the agency or a school district or regional education service |
---|
53 | 53 | | center. If the agency or a school district or regional education |
---|
54 | 54 | | service center chooses to provide independent individualized |
---|
55 | 55 | | education program facilitation, the facilitation must comply with |
---|
56 | 56 | | the criteria and procedures developed under this section. |
---|
57 | 57 | | (b) The criteria and procedures must include: |
---|
58 | 58 | | (1) a definition of independent individualized |
---|
59 | 59 | | education program facilitation; |
---|
60 | 60 | | (2) forms for implementing independent individualized |
---|
61 | 61 | | education program facilitation; |
---|
62 | 62 | | (3) training requirements for independent |
---|
63 | 63 | | facilitators; and |
---|
64 | 64 | | (4) an evaluation process through which information |
---|
65 | 65 | | may be collected regarding the implementation and effectiveness of |
---|
66 | 66 | | independent individualized education program facilitation provided |
---|
67 | 67 | | by the agency or a school district or regional education service |
---|
68 | 68 | | center. |
---|
69 | 69 | | (c) If the commissioner determines that adequate funding is |
---|
70 | 70 | | available, the commissioner may authorize the use of state or |
---|
71 | 71 | | federal funds to assist school districts and regional education |
---|
72 | 72 | | service centers in providing independent individualized education |
---|
73 | 73 | | program facilitation. |
---|
74 | 74 | | (d) Each regional education service center shall maintain a |
---|
75 | 75 | | list of independent facilitators who meet the criteria described by |
---|
76 | 76 | | Subsection (b)(3) and make the list available to school districts |
---|
77 | 77 | | and parents who choose to use independent individualized education |
---|
78 | 78 | | program facilitation. |
---|
79 | 79 | | (e) The commissioner shall adopt rules necessary to |
---|
80 | 80 | | implement this section. |
---|
81 | 81 | | SECTION 2. Not later than January 1, 2013, the Texas |
---|
82 | 82 | | Education Agency shall submit a report to the legislature regarding |
---|
83 | 83 | | the implementation and effectiveness of individualized education |
---|
84 | 84 | | program facilitation, including facilitation provided by an |
---|
85 | 85 | | independent facilitator and facilitation provided by a school |
---|
86 | 86 | | district employee acting as a facilitator. |
---|
87 | 87 | | SECTION 3. This Act applies beginning with the 2011-2012 |
---|
88 | 88 | | school year. |
---|
89 | 89 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
90 | 90 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
91 | 91 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
92 | 92 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
93 | 93 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
94 | 94 | | * * * * * |
---|