E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6276
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4000
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4525
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3576
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5422
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5421
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1405
|
Journal Page: 5422
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5422
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5422
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5411
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5411
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4618
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3731
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2653
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2653
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1375
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1334
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1334
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1334
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1333
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1333
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1333
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1333
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Shapiro
|
Journal Page: 1333
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1333
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1332
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1163
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 663
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 663
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|