E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6276
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4000
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4525
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3613
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1414
|
Journal Page: 5432
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5432
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5432
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5191
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 5191
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/24/11 4:45 PM
|
Journal Page: 5178
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5178
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4618
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3636
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2547
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2547
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2090
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1292
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1245
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1245
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1245
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1244
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1244
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1244
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1244
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1134
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 664
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 664
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|