House | 05/11/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 3648 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3648 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3525 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2224 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2167 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2167 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2167 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2167 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2167 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2167 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 2167 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Hinojosa | Journal Page: 2167 |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2167 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2167 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 2193 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1645 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 216 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 216 | |
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |