Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB146 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 146
 (In the Senate - Filed November 8, 2010; January 31, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 May 2, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 2, 2011, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 146 By:  Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the offense of smuggling of persons and unlawful
 transport of an individual; providing penalties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Chapter 20, Penal Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 20.  KIDNAPPING, [AND] UNLAWFUL RESTRAINT, AND
 SMUGGLING OF PERSONS
 SECTION 2.  Section 20.05, Penal Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 20.05.  SMUGGLING OF PERSONS [UNLAWFUL TRANSPORT].
 (a)  A person commits an offense if the person intentionally uses a
 motor vehicle, aircraft, or watercraft to transport an individual
 with the intent to conceal the individual from a peace officer or
 special investigator and flees from a person the actor knows is a
 peace officer or special investigator attempting to lawfully arrest
 or detain the actor [for pecuniary benefit transports an individual
 in a manner that:
 [(1)     is designed to conceal the individual from local,
 state, or federal law enforcement authorities; and
 [(2)     creates a substantial likelihood that the
 individual will suffer serious bodily injury or death].
 (b)  Except as provided by Subsection (c), an [An] offense
 under this section is a state jail felony.
 (c)  An offense under this section is a felony of the third
 degree if the actor commits the offense:
 (1)  for pecuniary benefit; or
 (2)  in a manner that creates a substantial likelihood
 that the transported individual will suffer serious bodily injury
 or death.
 (d)  It is an affirmative defense to prosecution under this
 section that the actor is related to the transported individual
 within the third degree of consanguinity or, at the time of the
 offense, within the third degree of affinity.
 (e)  If conduct constituting an offense under this section
 also constitutes an offense under another section of this code, the
 actor may be prosecuted under either section.
 SECTION 3.  Subsection (a), Section 71.02, Penal Code, as
 amended by Chapters 153 (S.B. 2225), 1130 (H.B. 2086), and 1357
 (S.B. 554), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, is
 reenacted and amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A person commits an offense if, with the intent to
 establish, maintain, or participate in a combination or in the
 profits of a combination or as a member of a criminal street gang,
 the person commits or conspires to commit one or more of the
 following:
 (1)  murder, capital murder, arson, aggravated
 robbery, robbery, burglary, theft, aggravated kidnapping,
 kidnapping, aggravated assault, aggravated sexual assault, sexual
 assault, forgery, deadly conduct, assault punishable as a Class A
 misdemeanor, burglary of a motor vehicle, or unauthorized use of a
 motor vehicle;
 (2)  any gambling offense punishable as a Class A
 misdemeanor;
 (3)  promotion of prostitution, aggravated promotion
 of prostitution, or compelling prostitution;
 (4)  unlawful manufacture, transportation, repair, or
 sale of firearms or prohibited weapons;
 (5)  unlawful manufacture, delivery, dispensation, or
 distribution of a controlled substance or dangerous drug, or
 unlawful possession of a controlled substance or dangerous drug
 through forgery, fraud, misrepresentation, or deception;
 (6)  any unlawful wholesale promotion or possession of
 any obscene material or obscene device with the intent to wholesale
 promote the same;
 (7)  any offense under Subchapter B, Chapter 43,
 depicting or involving conduct by or directed toward a child
 younger than 18 years of age;
 (8)  any felony offense under Chapter 32;
 (9)  any offense under Chapter 36;
 (10)  any offense under Chapter 34 or 35;
 (11)  any offense under Section 37.11(a);
 (12)  any offense under Chapter 20A;
 (13)  any offense under Section 37.10; [or]
 (14)  any offense under Section 38.06, 38.07, 38.09, or
 38.11;
 (15) [(14)]  any offense under Section 42.10;
 (16) [(14)]  any offense under Section 46.06(a)(1) or
 46.14; or
 (17)  any offense under Section 20.05.
 SECTION 4.  Article 13.12, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Art. 13.12.  FALSE IMPRISONMENT, [AND] KIDNAPPING, AND
 SMUGGLING OF PERSONS
 Venue for false imprisonment, [and] kidnapping, and
 smuggling of persons is in either the county in which the offense
 was committed, or in any county through, into, or out of which the
 person falsely imprisoned, [or] kidnapped, or transported may have
 been taken.
 SECTION 5.  Subdivision (2), Article 59.01, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, as amended by Chapters 153 (S.B. 2225), 1130 (H.B.
 2086), and 1357 (S.B. 554), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2009, is reenacted and amended to read as follows:
 (2)  "Contraband" means property of any nature,
 including real, personal, tangible, or intangible, that is:
 (A)  used in the commission of:
 (i)  any first or second degree felony under
 the Penal Code;
 (ii)  any felony under Section 15.031(b),
 20.05, 21.11, 38.04, Subchapter B of Chapter 43, or Chapter 29, 30,
 31, 32, 33, 33A, or 35, Penal Code;
 (iii)  any felony under The Securities Act
 (Article 581-1 et seq., Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes); or
 (iv)  any offense under Chapter 49, Penal
 Code, that is punishable as a felony of the third degree or state
 jail felony, if the defendant has been previously convicted three
 times of an offense under that chapter;
 (B)  used or intended to be used in the commission
 of:
 (i)  any felony under Chapter 481, Health
 and Safety Code (Texas Controlled Substances Act);
 (ii)  any felony under Chapter 483, Health
 and Safety Code;
 (iii)  a felony under Chapter 153, Finance
 Code;
 (iv)  any felony under Chapter 34, Penal
 Code;
 (v)  a Class A misdemeanor under Subchapter
 B, Chapter 365, Health and Safety Code, if the defendant has been
 previously convicted twice of an offense under that subchapter;
 (vi)  any felony under Chapter 152, Finance
 Code;
 (vii)  any felony under Chapter 32, Human
 Resources Code, or Chapter 31, 32, 35A, or 37, Penal Code, that
 involves the state Medicaid program;
 (viii)  a Class B misdemeanor under Chapter
 522, Business & Commerce Code;
 (ix)  a Class A misdemeanor under Section
 306.051, Business & Commerce Code; [or]
 (x)  any offense under Section 42.10, Penal
 Code;
 (xi) [(x)]  any offense under Section
 46.06(a)(1) or 46.14, Penal Code;
 (xii) [(x)]  any offense under Chapter 71,
 Penal Code; or
 (xiii)  any offense under Section 20.05,
 Penal Code;
 (C)  the proceeds gained from the commission of a
 felony listed in Paragraph (A) or (B) of this subdivision, a
 misdemeanor listed in Paragraph (B)(viii), [or] (x), (xi), or (xii)
 of this subdivision, or a crime of violence;
 (D)  acquired with proceeds gained from the
 commission of a felony listed in Paragraph (A) or (B) of this
 subdivision, a misdemeanor listed in Paragraph (B)(viii), [or] (x),
 (xi), or (xii) of this subdivision, or a crime of violence; or
 (E)  used to facilitate or intended to be used to
 facilitate the commission of a felony under Section 15.031 or
 43.25, Penal Code.
 SECTION 6.  The changes in law made by this Act in amending
 Sections 20.05 and 71.02, Penal Code, apply only to an offense
 committed on or after the effective date of this Act.  An offense
 committed before the effective date of this Act is covered by the
 law in effect when the offense was committed, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.  For purposes of this section,
 an offense was committed before the effective date of this Act if
 any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 7.  The change in law made by this Act in amending
 Subdivision (2), Article 59.01, Code of Criminal Procedure, applies
 only to the forfeiture of property in relation to an offense
 committed on or after the effective date of this Act.  Forfeiture of
 property in relation to an offense committed before the effective
 date of this Act is governed by the law in effect when the offense
 was committed, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.  For purposes of this section, an offense was committed
 before the effective date of this Act if any element of the offense
 occurred before that date.
 SECTION 8.  To the extent of any conflict, this Act prevails
 over another Act of the 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011,
 relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted
 codes.
 SECTION 9.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *