House | 04/29/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2547 | |
House | 04/29/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2547 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2169 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1344 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1289 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 963 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 673 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 673 | |
Senate | 03/10/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |