House | 04/11/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1660 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1660 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1571 | |
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1004 | |
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 951 | |
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 951 | |
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 951 | |
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 950 | |
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 950 | |
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 950 | |
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 950 | |
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 901 | |
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/29/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 674 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 674 | |
Senate | 03/10/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |