Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1532 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 1532
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2011; March 22, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; April 29, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 April 29, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1532 By:  Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a photograph on a personal identification certificate,
 driver's license, or commercial driver's license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 521.101, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (k) to read as follows:
 (k)  The department may include a color or laser engraved
 photograph of the holder of the personal identification
 certificate.
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (a), Section 521.121, Transportation
 Code, as amended by Chapters 316 (H.B. 598) and 1146 (H.B. 2730),
 Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, is reenacted
 and amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The driver's license must include:
 (1)  a distinguishing number assigned by the department
 to the license holder;
 (2)  a color or laser engraved photograph of the entire
 face of the holder;
 (3)  the full name and date of birth of the holder;
 (4)  a brief description of the holder; and
 (5)  the license holder's residence address or, for a
 license holder using the procedure under Subsection (c), the street
 address of the courthouse in which the license holder or license
 holder's spouse serves as a federal judge or state judge.
 SECTION 3.  Section 522.030, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 522.030.  CONTENT OF LICENSE. A commercial driver's
 license must:
 (1)  be marked "Commercial Driver License" or "CDL";
 (2)  be, to the extent practicable, tamper-proof; and
 (3)  include:
 (A)  the name and mailing address of the person to
 whom it is issued;
 (B)  the person's color or laser engraved
 photograph;
 (C)  a physical description of the person,
 including sex, height, and eye color;
 (D)  the person's date of birth;
 (E)  a number or identifier the department
 considers appropriate;
 (F)  the person's signature;
 (G)  each class of commercial motor vehicle that
 the person is authorized to drive, with any endorsements or
 restrictions;
 (H)  the name of this state; and
 (I)  the dates between which the license is valid.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a driver's license, personal identification certificate, or
 commercial driver's license issued or renewed on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A driver's license, personal
 identification certificate, or commercial driver's license issued
 or renewed before the effective date of this Act is governed by the
 law in effect when the license or certificate was issued, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  To the extent of any conflict, this Act prevails
 over another Act of the 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011,
 relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted
 codes.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *