Senate | 05/05/2011 | Removed from local & uncontested calendar | Journal Page: 1764 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1343 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 677 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 677 | |
Senate | 03/10/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/10/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |