E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4526
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6276
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4000
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4034
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3702
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1448
|
Journal Page: 5472
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 5472
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5472
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 5374
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 5374
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4617
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3302
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2653
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2653
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2550
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1645
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1437
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1437
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1437
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1436
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1436
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1436
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1436
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1291
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 702
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 702
|
Senate
|
03/10/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|