E | 06/17/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5151 | |
E | 05/21/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2977 | |
House | 05/21/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4761 | |
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2777 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2977 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2635 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Record vote | RV#1160 | Journal Page: 4215 |
House | 05/19/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 4215 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4215 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 4212 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4209 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4209 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/12/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3829 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 2259 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2259 | |
House | 04/15/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1865 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1164 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1101 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1101 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1101 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1101 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1101 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1101 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1100 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1026 | |
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal | Journal Page: 708 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 708 | |
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |