House | 05/19/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 4225 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2711 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2564 | |
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2147 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 709 | |
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |