Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1645 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Uresti S.B. No. 1645
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2011; March 23, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs and
 Military Installations; May 9, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 9, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority to create and operate a defense
 adjustment management authority.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter O, Chapter 375, Local Government
 Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *