House | 05/17/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/17/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 2547 | |
House | 04/29/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2547 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2169 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1344 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1290 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1290 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1290 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1290 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1290 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1290 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1290 | |
Senate | 04/21/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1025 | |
Senate | 04/06/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 710 | |
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 642 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 615 | |
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |