E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5151
|
E
|
05/25/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3794
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5382
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3430
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3527
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2983
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4707
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1257
|
Journal Page: 4706
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4706
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4706
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1194
|
Journal Page: 4378
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4378
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 4378
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/20/11 8:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 4212
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4212
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4063
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2385
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2385
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2262
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1375
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1308
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1308
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1308
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1307
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1307
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1307
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1307
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1341
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
Senate
|
03/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2011
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|