1 | 1 | | By: Ellis S.B. No. 1676 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2011; March 23, 2011, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice; |
---|
4 | 4 | | April 7, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, |
---|
5 | 5 | | Nays 0; April 7, 2011, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to educational and training requirements for certain peace |
---|
11 | 11 | | officers on ethical decision making. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter F, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is |
---|
14 | 14 | | amended by adding Section 1701.260 to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 15 | | Sec. 1701.260. EDUCATION AND TRAINING PROGRAMS ON ETHICAL |
---|
16 | 16 | | DECISION MAKING. (a) The commission by rule shall require an |
---|
17 | 17 | | officer to complete an eight-hour training program on ethical |
---|
18 | 18 | | decision making once during the year beginning on September 1, |
---|
19 | 19 | | 2012, and once every 24 months for the two Commission on Law |
---|
20 | 20 | | Enforcement Officer Standards and Education training cycles |
---|
21 | 21 | | beginning September 1, 2013. |
---|
22 | 22 | | (b) The program described by Subsection (a) must be approved |
---|
23 | 23 | | by the commission and shall be conducted by the governmental entity |
---|
24 | 24 | | that employs the officer. The program must include education and |
---|
25 | 25 | | training on: |
---|
26 | 26 | | (1) identification of ethical dilemmas in law |
---|
27 | 27 | | enforcement; |
---|
28 | 28 | | (2) stress inoculation, de-escalation, and crisis |
---|
29 | 29 | | management techniques; |
---|
30 | 30 | | (3) principles of ethics and decision making in law |
---|
31 | 31 | | enforcement as they relate to use of force; |
---|
32 | 32 | | (4) public accountability and police professionalism; |
---|
33 | 33 | | and |
---|
34 | 34 | | (5) application in scenario-based ethical dilemmas. |
---|
35 | 35 | | (c) A trainer of a course described by this section may use |
---|
36 | 36 | | curriculum and instructional materials developed by the |
---|
37 | 37 | | commission, a governmental entity conducting a course, and an |
---|
38 | 38 | | entity that has a training agreement with the commission. |
---|
39 | 39 | | (d) This section expires September 1, 2021. |
---|
40 | 40 | | SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2011, the Commission |
---|
41 | 41 | | on Law Enforcement Officer Standards and Education shall adopt the |
---|
42 | 42 | | rules necessary to implement Section 1701.260, Occupations Code, as |
---|
43 | 43 | | added by this Act. |
---|
44 | 44 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
45 | 45 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
46 | 46 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
47 | 47 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
48 | 48 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
49 | 49 | | * * * * * |
---|