Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1676 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Ellis S.B. No. 1676
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2011; March 23, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 7, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 7, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to educational and training requirements for certain peace
 officers on ethical decision making.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter F, Chapter 1701, Occupations Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1701.260 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1701.260.  EDUCATION AND TRAINING PROGRAMS ON ETHICAL
 DECISION MAKING.  (a)  The commission by rule shall require an
 officer to complete an eight-hour training program on ethical
 decision making once during the year beginning on September 1,
 2012, and once every 24 months for the two Commission on Law
 Enforcement Officer Standards and Education training cycles
 beginning September 1, 2013.
 (b)  The program described by Subsection (a) must be approved
 by the commission and shall be conducted by the governmental entity
 that employs the officer.  The program must include education and
 training on:
 (1)  identification of ethical dilemmas in law
 enforcement;
 (2)  stress inoculation, de-escalation, and crisis
 management techniques;
 (3)  principles of ethics and decision making in law
 enforcement as they relate to use of force;
 (4)  public accountability and police professionalism;
 and
 (5)  application in scenario-based ethical dilemmas.
 (c)  A trainer of a course described by this section may use
 curriculum and instructional materials developed by the
 commission, a governmental entity conducting a course, and an
 entity that has a training agreement with the commission.
 (d)  This section expires September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 1, 2011, the Commission
 on Law Enforcement Officer Standards and Education shall adopt the
 rules necessary to implement Section 1701.260, Occupations Code, as
 added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *