1 | 1 | | By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1731 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2011; March 23, 2011, read |
---|
3 | 3 | | first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education; |
---|
4 | 4 | | April 28, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, |
---|
5 | 5 | | Nays 0; April 28, 2011, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to requiring public junior colleges to offer an academic |
---|
11 | 11 | | associate degree program. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 130, Education Code, is |
---|
14 | 14 | | amended by adding Section 130.0013 to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 15 | | Sec. 130.0013. ACADEMIC ASSOCIATE DEGREE PROGRAM. |
---|
16 | 16 | | (a) Each public junior college shall offer one or more academic |
---|
17 | 17 | | associate degree programs designed to transfer in their entirety |
---|
18 | 18 | | for course credit in a baccalaureate degree program at a general |
---|
19 | 19 | | academic teaching institution. |
---|
20 | 20 | | (b) An academic associate degree program must consist of at |
---|
21 | 21 | | least 60 semester credit hours, but not exceed 66 semester credit |
---|
22 | 22 | | hours. |
---|
23 | 23 | | (c) An academic associate degree program curriculum must |
---|
24 | 24 | | incorporate: |
---|
25 | 25 | | (1) a core curriculum established under Section |
---|
26 | 26 | | 61.822; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (2) a statewide articulated transfer curriculum |
---|
28 | 28 | | approved by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board that |
---|
29 | 29 | | aligns with the lower-division requirements of one or more specific |
---|
30 | 30 | | baccalaureate degree programs; or |
---|
31 | 31 | | (3) a specified curriculum covered by an articulation |
---|
32 | 32 | | agreement between the junior college district and one or more other |
---|
33 | 33 | | institutions of higher education. |
---|
34 | 34 | | (d) An academic associate degree program offered under this |
---|
35 | 35 | | section must meet all applicable accreditation requirements of the |
---|
36 | 36 | | Southern Association of Colleges and Schools Commission on |
---|
37 | 37 | | Colleges. |
---|
38 | 38 | | (e) The coordinating board shall adopt rules the board |
---|
39 | 39 | | considers appropriate for the administration of this section. |
---|
40 | 40 | | SECTION 2. The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board |
---|
41 | 41 | | and the governing board of each junior college district shall adopt |
---|
42 | 42 | | rules or policies relating to the academic associate degree program |
---|
43 | 43 | | under Section 130.0013, Education Code, as added by this Act, not |
---|
44 | 44 | | later than February 1, 2012. |
---|
45 | 45 | | SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies |
---|
46 | 46 | | beginning with the 2012 fall semester. |
---|
47 | 47 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
48 | 48 | | * * * * * |
---|