Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1731 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 1731
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2011; March 23, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 28, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; April 28, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring public junior colleges to offer an academic
 associate degree program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 130, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 130.0013 to read as follows:
 Sec. 130.0013.  ACADEMIC ASSOCIATE DEGREE PROGRAM.
 (a)  Each public junior college shall offer one or more academic
 associate degree programs designed to transfer in their entirety
 for course credit in a baccalaureate degree program at a general
 academic teaching institution.
 (b)  An academic associate degree program must consist of at
 least 60 semester credit hours, but not exceed 66 semester credit
 hours.
 (c)  An academic associate degree program curriculum must
 incorporate:
 (1)  a core curriculum established under Section
 61.822;
 (2)  a statewide articulated transfer curriculum
 approved by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board that
 aligns with the lower-division requirements of one or more specific
 baccalaureate degree programs; or
 (3)  a specified curriculum covered by an articulation
 agreement between the junior college district and one or more other
 institutions of higher education.
 (d)  An academic associate degree program offered under this
 section must meet all applicable accreditation requirements of the
 Southern Association of Colleges and Schools Commission on
 Colleges.
 (e)  The coordinating board shall adopt rules the board
 considers appropriate for the administration of this section.
 SECTION 2.  The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board
 and the governing board of each junior college district shall adopt
 rules or policies relating to the academic associate degree program
 under Section 130.0013, Education Code, as added by this Act, not
 later than February 1, 2012.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies
 beginning with the 2012 fall semester.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *