House | 05/24/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/16/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/13/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 4063 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/11/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2548 | |
House | 04/29/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2548 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2390 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1603 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1408 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1408 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1408 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1408 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1408 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1408 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1407 | |
Senate | 04/28/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1426 | |
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1233 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal | Journal Page: 718 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 718 | |
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |