Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1829 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Wentworth S.B. No. 1829
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2011; March 24, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Select Committee on Open Government;
 May 6, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 3, Nays 0; May 6, 2011, sent
 to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1829 By:  Wentworth


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the application of the public information law to
 chambers of commerce and nonprofit corporations that provide
 economic services to a governmental body.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 552, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 552.0038 to read as follows:
 Sec. 552.0038.  CHAMBERS OF COMMERCE AND NONPROFIT
 CORPORATIONS PROVIDING ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT SERVICES.
 Notwithstanding any other law, a chamber of commerce or nonprofit
 corporation that provides economic development services to a
 governmental body is subject to this chapter only with respect to
 information that the chamber of commerce or nonprofit corporation
 collects, assembles, or maintains and that relates to public funds
 received by the chamber of commerce or nonprofit corporation and
 paid to or for the benefit of a public employee or other public
 official, or a group of such public employees or other public
 officials.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *