Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1849 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hegar S.B. No. 1849
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2011; March 24, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 20, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 20, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1849 By:  Harris


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to furthering stability and affordable service in the
 communications industry through the universal service fund.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 56.025, Utilities Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (g) to read as follows:
 (g)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), a local exchange
 company that has been receiving support under a commission order
 issued under this section before January 1, 2005, is entitled to
 continue to receive that support.  The commission may not require
 the company to reimburse the commission for support that the
 company received under this section on or after January 1, 2005, and
 before the date this subsection takes effect.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *