House | 05/18/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 3297 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3297 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3176 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2147 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1927 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1927 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1927 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1927 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1927 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1927 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 1926 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Uresti | Journal Page: 1926 |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1926 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1926 | |
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1708 | |
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 1131 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1131 | |
Senate | 04/14/2011 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1130 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |