Senate | 05/06/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/05/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1645 | |
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Referred to International Relations and Trade | Journal Page: 1161 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1161 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Permission to introduce | Journal Page: 1161 | |
Senate | 04/15/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |