04/28/2011 | Referred to Ways & Means | |||
04/28/2011 | Read first time | |||
04/13/2011 | Received from the Senate | |||
04/12/2011 | Reported engrossed | |||
04/12/2011 | Passed | |||
04/12/2011 | Read 3rd time | |||
04/12/2011 | Record vote | |||
04/12/2011 | Three day rule suspended | |||
04/12/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |||
04/12/2011 | Amended | |||
04/12/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | |||
04/12/2011 | Read 2nd time | |||
04/12/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | |||
04/12/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |||
04/12/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | |||
04/07/2011 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |||
04/04/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | |||
04/04/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | |||
03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | |||
03/14/2011 | Left pending in committee | |||
03/14/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |||
02/22/2011 | Co-author authorized | |||
01/31/2011 | Referred to Administration | |||
11/10/2010 | Filed | |||
11/10/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |