House
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4618
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3637
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2652
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2652
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2261
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1375
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1306
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1306
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1306
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1306
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1305
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1305
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1305
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1341
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1232
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1163
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 224
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 224
|
Senate
|
11/18/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/18/2010
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|