Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB228 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Nelson, Nichols S.B. No. 228
 (In the Senate - Filed November 18, 2010; January 31, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; March 14, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 14, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to reporting requirements for institutions of higher
 education conducting human stem cell research.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (h), Section 61.051, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (h)  The board shall make continuing studies of the needs of
 the state for research and designate the institutions of higher
 education to perform research as needed. The board shall also
 maintain an inventory of all institutional and programmatic
 research activities being conducted by the various institutions,
 whether state-financed or not. Once a year, on dates prescribed by
 the board, each institution of higher education shall report to the
 board all research conducted at that institution during the last
 preceding year. Each institution's report must include the amounts
 spent by the institution on human embryonic stem cell research and
 adult stem cell research during the year covered by the report and
 the source of the funding for that research.  All reports required
 by this subsection shall be made subject to the limitations imposed
 by security regulations governing defense contracts for research.
 Not later than January 1 of each year, the board shall submit to the
 legislature information regarding human stem cell research
 obtained by the board from reports required by this subsection.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *