House
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 4765
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2907
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 1150
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1150
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1070
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 735
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 651
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 650
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 650
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 650
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 650
|
Senate
|
03/22/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 391
|
Senate
|
02/15/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2011
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 305
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 225
|
Senate
|
01/31/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 225
|
Senate
|
11/29/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/29/2010
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|