E | 05/28/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 05/28/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5040 | |
E | 05/18/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 2553 | |
House | 05/17/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4118 | |
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2472 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 2510 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2336 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3864 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3863 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | RV#1044 | Journal Page: 3864 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3864 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3864 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3834 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3834 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB1324 | Journal Page: 3834 |
House | 04/20/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2170 | |
House | 04/12/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | Journal Page: 1150 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1150 | |
House | 03/23/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1071 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 771 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 691 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 691 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 691 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 691 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 691 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 691 | |
Senate | 03/23/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 690 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 617 | |
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/07/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 226 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 226 | |
Senate | 12/07/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/07/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |