Senate | 04/19/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/04/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 900 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 866 | |
Senate | 03/22/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 678 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 584 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 205 | |
Senate | 01/31/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 205 | |
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/08/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |