Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB291 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Watson S.B. No. 291
 (In the Senate - Filed December 21, 2010; January 31, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 7, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 7, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 291 By:  Davis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an alcohol awareness component of the science
 curriculum used in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (r), Section 28.002, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (r)  The [In adopting the essential knowledge and skills for
 the health curriculum under Subsection    (a)(2)(B), the] State Board
 of Education by rule shall require a school district or
 open-enrollment charter school to provide instruction [adopt
 essential knowledge and skills] that addresses [address] the
 dangers, causes, consequences, signs, symptoms, and treatment of
 binge drinking and alcohol poisoning to students in middle school,
 junior high school, and high school.  The agency shall compile a
 list of evidence-based alcohol awareness programs from which a
 school district or open-enrollment charter school shall choose a
 program to use in the district's or school's middle school, junior
 high school, and high school science [health] curriculum.  A high
 school shall use a program chosen under this subsection in a course
 that satisfies the science curriculum requirement for graduation
 under Section 28.025(b-1)(1)(A).  In this subsection,
 "evidence-based alcohol awareness program" means a program,
 practice, or strategy that has been proven to effectively prevent
 or delay alcohol use among students, as determined by evaluations
 that use valid and reliable measures and that are published in
 peer-reviewed journals.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2011-2012
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *