House | 04/29/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1545 | |
House | 03/31/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1109 | |
House | 03/29/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1109 | |
House | 03/17/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 900 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 617 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 544 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 544 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 544 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 544 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 543 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 543 | |
Senate | 03/16/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 543 | |
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 515 | |
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/08/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 411 | |
Senate | 02/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 411 | |
Senate | 12/21/2010 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/21/2010 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |