E | 04/29/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 04/29/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1604 | |
E | 04/20/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1281 | |
House | 04/19/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2002 | |
Senate | 04/19/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1170 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1234 | |
Senate | 04/18/2011 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1142 | |
House | 04/15/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1847 | |
House | 04/15/2011 | Record vote | RV#393 | Journal Page: 1847 |
House | 04/15/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1847 | |
House | 04/15/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1847 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1804 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1804 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1804 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1599 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 1109 | |
House | 03/29/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1109 | |
House | 03/22/2011 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 941 | |
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 629 | |
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 629 | |
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 629 | |
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 628 | |
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 628 | |
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 628 | |
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Amended | Journal Page: 628 | |
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Shapiro | Journal Page: 627 |
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 627 | |
Senate | 03/21/2011 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 627 | |
Senate | 03/17/2011 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/14/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 525 | |
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/09/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 256 | |
Senate | 02/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 256 | |
Senate | 01/03/2011 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/03/2011 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |